+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Women's Issues
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.931
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Women's Issues
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Women's Issues)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 5, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Women's Issues)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1