+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.552
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.715
- Substituted For A7648
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1424
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 4
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor