+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.607
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5580b
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5580a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor