+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5563c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5563b
- Amend And Recommit To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5563a
- Amend And Recommit To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
+ − Vote
May 17, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor