+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5553b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Insurance
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Insurance
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5553a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor