+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5552b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5552a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19