+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.54
- Signed Chap.488
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.459
- Substituted For A7216
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.650
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor