+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5536a
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.440
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities 1
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.824
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities 1
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Cities 1)
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Cities 1)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor