+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1047
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor