+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.615
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.793
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 19
May 9, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor