+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 5471a
- Amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Alcoholism and Drug Abuse - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: absent
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Alcoholism and Drug Abuse - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: absent
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor