+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.67
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.83
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
February 22, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 20, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor