+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.68
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1030
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse)
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse)
- Yeas: 7