+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.73
On November 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.691
- Substituted For A7554b
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5451c
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5451b
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.120
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5451a
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.852
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 10
January 11, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
June 7, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 15
April 14, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor