+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.710
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.283
- Substituted For A7476
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.801
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor