+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A1005a
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5434a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.844
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 16
April 28, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor