+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7500a
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.941
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5427a
- Amend And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Vote
May 18, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor