+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.182
On November 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.689
- Substituted For A7062
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.941
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor