+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to crime victims, crime and correction
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to crime victims, crime and correction
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Crime Victims, Crime and Correction - Mar 26, 2014
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: nay
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Crime Victims, Crime and Correction - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor