+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7604
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.900
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Vote
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor