+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7568
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1278
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
April 26, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor