+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1608
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5394a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Education
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 4