+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1143
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.668
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
May 17, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor