+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A6893a
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.816
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5385a
- Amend And Recommit To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
+ − Vote
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor