+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7520
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.935
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Vote
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor