+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.238
On July 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.631
- Substituted For A5764a
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.912
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5348a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 15, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor