+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.80
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.569
- Substituted For A7748
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1146
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor