+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.640
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.493
- Substituted For A2880b
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1509
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5328a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Insurance
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor