+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7612a
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1176
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5328a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor