+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.747
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.677
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
May 10, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 25, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor