+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5321a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.749
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor