+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7008b
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5317a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.518
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor