+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.533
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
March 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Procurement And Contracts)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor