+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.135
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.597
- Substituted For A7064c
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
- Repassed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5305b
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5305a
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.579
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor