+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1249
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1330
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Votes (4)
June 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 5
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 11
June 3, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor