+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5289a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1494
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
May 17, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor