+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.93
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1674
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
February 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 16
June 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor