+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.2
- Signed Chap.90
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.493
- Substituted For A6910b
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5251b
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.794
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5251a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor