+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.991
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Vote
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor