+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.251
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1217
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (5)
January 22, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 23
January 14, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
June 6, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 6, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor