+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1640
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5242a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25