+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5236b
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.263
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5236a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1490
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 18
January 19, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5
June 7, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 17
June 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor