+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.479
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.330
- Substituted For A3072a
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1490
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5216a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor