+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.991
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5196b
- Amend And Recommit To Aging
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5196a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Aging
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 11, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 7