+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.365
On September 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.134
- Substituted For A7253
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.297
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.590
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 23
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor