+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7202a
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1064
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor