+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.846
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.516
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
May 15, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 12
May 23, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
March 27, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13