+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.737
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Vote
May 14, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor