+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.346
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.546
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor