+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7721
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.683
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
May 18, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 16